skip to content

Flock, Traudl Elisabeth

CPSO#: 31049

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 04 Mar 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Mar 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Traudl E. Flock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 4 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St.Regis Cres S North York ON M3J 1Y8 Tel: 416-398-0638
Date Received: 05 Mar 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Mar 2019