skip to content

Flett, Norman Ross

CPSO#: 22242

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Villa
56 Governors Road
Dundas ON  L9H 5G7
Phone: (905) 627-3541 Ext. 2229
Fax: (905) 628-0825 Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: 9056 Governers Rd Dundas ON L9H 5G7
Date Received: 22 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019