skip to content

Fleming, Russel Leroy

CPSO#: 23243

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Oct 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care, 500 Church Street, Penetanguishene, ON, L9M 1G3
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016