skip to content

Fleming, Rachel Pollard

CPSO#: 93658

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5608 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
76 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-323-6400 Ext. 4544
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 8751
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Health Sciences North
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017
Corporation Name: Rachel Fleming Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fleming ( CPSO# 93658 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011 Active
 Dr. Rachel Pollard Fleming may practise medicine independently in
                  Diagnostic Radiology, only.