skip to content

Fleming, Lindsay Alexandra

CPSO#: 100469

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Division of Adolescent Medicine
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-1500 Ext. 204223 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LINDSAY ALEXANDRA FLEMING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLEMING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017