skip to content

Fleischer-Djoleto, Albert Ofei

CPSO#: 27771

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 1-Mar-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English, Ga

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Fleischer-Djoleto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 27 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:16 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1973 to 14 Jun 1974
Other - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1974 to 31 Dec 1974
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1975 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2015