skip to content

Fleck, Janet Marie

CPSO#: 94135

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Jul 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Indiana University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pathology & Laboratory Med. Serv.
Veterans Healthcare Sys of Ozarks
1100 N. College Ave.
Fayetteville AR  72703
United States
Phone: 479-443-4301 Ext. 65276
Fax: 479-587-5829

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Illinois

USA - Indiana

USA - Kansas

USA - Michigan

USA - Missouri

USA - New York

USA - Oregon

USA - Tennessee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 05 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Nov 2011

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011 Active
 
                  Dr. Janet Marie Fleck may practise medicine independently in Anatomical
                  Pathology, only.