skip to content

Fleck, Janet Marie

CPSO#: 94135

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Indiana University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lab Administration, Room 507
Cell & Virus Bldg.
Roswell Park Compreh. Cancer Ctr.
Elm & Carlton Streets
Buffalo NY  14263-0001
United States
Phone: 716-845-1300 Ext. 5190
Fax: 716-845-8096

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Illinois
USA - Indiana
USA - Kansas
USA - Michigan
USA - Missouri
USA - New York
USA - Oregon
USA - Tennessee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:05 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Nov 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011 Active
 
                  Dr. Janet Marie Fleck may practise medicine independently in Anatomical
                  Pathology, only.