skip to content

Flatman, John Garneys

CPSO#: 26577

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 May 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 May 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 12-Jan-2007

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1999
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 May 2003