skip to content

Flamer, Cara Elanna

CPSO#: 84890

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
801 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone: 4167892449
Fax: 4167892253 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

301-358 Dufferin St
Toronto ON  M6K 1Z8
Canada
Phone: 4372669242
Fax: 4373179611
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Cara Flamer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Flamer ( CPSO# 84890 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 789-2449

Business Address:
2888 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6B 4H6
Phone Number: 4166303614


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CARA ELANNA FLAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLAMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008