skip to content

Fiume, Andrea Michelle

CPSO#: 98173

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: Kirou-Mauro, Andrea Michelle (used until: 03 May 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boomerang Health
9401 Jane St
Until 211
Maple ON  L6A 4H7
Phone: 905-553-3155 Ext. 300
Fax: 905-553-8120 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Canada
Phone: 416-654-5437
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREA MICHELLE FIUME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIUME is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2017