skip to content

Fitzpatrick, David James

CPSO#: 30656

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Fitzpatrick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fitzpatrick ( CPSO# 30656 )

Business Address:
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway #2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone Number: (905) 721-4900

Medical Records Location

Address: Oshawa Clinic 117 King Street East Oshawa, Ontario L1H 1B9
Date Received: 21 May 2020


Address: The Oshawa Clinic 117 King St E Oshawa, ON L1H 1B9 and The Coutrice Health Clinic 1450 Durham Regional Hwy 2 Courtice, ON L1E 3C3
Date Received: 09 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020