skip to content

Fitzpatrick, Alanna Victoria

CPSO#: 100683

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: Borris, Alanna Victoria (used until: 06 Mar 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hasegawa Clinic
Suite 101
342 Erie St
Stratford ON  N5A 2N4
Phone: 5192716711
Fax: 5192718533 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alanna Fitzpatrick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fitzpatrick ( CPSO# 100683)

Business Address:
Hasegawa Clinic
Suite 101
342 Erie Street
Stratford ON  N5A 2N4
Phone Number: (519) 271-6711

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
267 Queen Street West
St Marys ON  N4X 1C4
Phone Number: (519) 284-1332

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALANNA VICTORIA FITZPATRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITZPATRICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018