skip to content

Fisher, Rory Henry Grattan

CPSO#: 24096

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Aug 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Science Centre 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 29 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015