skip to content

Fisher, Murray Malcolm

CPSO#: 17683

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.M. Fisher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 27 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Digestive Health Clinic, 301-1366 Yonge Street, Toronto, Ontario M4T 3A7
Date Received: 10 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2019