skip to content

Fisher, Cora Lillian

CPSO#: 29468

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004