skip to content

Fiser, Jarmila Emilia

CPSO#: 28104

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jan 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 1983

Summary

Former Names: Shiff, Jarmila Emilia (used until: 02 Jul 1986 )     Fiser-Shiff, Jarmila Emilia (used until: 20 Dec 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:University of Comenius, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3408
Fax: (905) 721-4757 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JARMILA EMILIA FISER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1983