skip to content

Firouzabadi-Dashti, Roya

CPSO#: 85122

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:BABOL UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Brooklin Medical Centre
Suite 1A
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Phone: (905) 655-3321
Fax: (905) 655-4848 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

7163 Yonge St.
Units 125,126,127
World on Yonge Medical Clinic
Thornhill ON  L3T0C6
Canada
Phone: 9055977275
Fax: 9055977276
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Roya Firouzabadi-Dashti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Firouzabadi-Dashti ( CPSO# 85122 )

Business Address:
The Brooklin Medical Centre
Suite 1A
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Phone Number: (905) 655-3321

Business Address:
7163 Yonge Street
Suite 126
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C6
Phone Number: (905) 597-7275

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROYA FIROUZABADI-DASHTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIROUZABADI-DASHTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008