skip to content

Fiorini, Cynthia Marie

CPSO#: 94199

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Jul 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oakville Medical
3075 Hospital Gate, Suite 318
Oakville, Ontario
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 338-8303
Fax: (905) 815-9528 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cynthia M. Fiorini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fiorini ( CPSO# 94199 )

Business Address:
318-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 338-8303


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:21 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012 Active
 
                  Dr.   Cynthia  Marie  Fiorini  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  Paediatrics in an office setting, only.