skip to content

Fiorellino, Joseph Nicholas

CPSO#: 98130

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
EN3-438
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3567
Fax: 4163403698 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joseph Fiorellino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fiorellino ( CPSO# 98130 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
EN3-438
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEPH NICHOLAS FIORELLINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIORELLINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017