skip to content

Finnis, William Albert

CPSO#: 29845

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Finnis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical Affairs Office, 50 College Drive, North Bay, ON, P1B 0A4
Date Received: 17 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016