skip to content

Finnie, Keith James Campbell

CPSO#: 31750

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Keith J. C. Finnie Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 1 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 4 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014