skip to content

Finkelstein, Sheldon Charles

CPSO#: 31280

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jan 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S.C. Finkelstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 8 2015

Medical Records Location

Instructions: P.O Box 35030, 1421 Grand Marais West, Windsor, ON N9E 4V0
Date Received: 21 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015