skip to content

Finkelstein, Lorne Stephen

CPSO#: 25560

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Apr 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Anslow Court
Dundas ON  L9H 6Z2
Phone: 9056275924 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. L. Finkelstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Finkelstein ( CPSO# 25560 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record may contact Safe Store Records Management 2704 Hwy 20 Fonthill ON L0S 1E6 Tel: 95-892-0010 Fax: 905-892-9465
Date Received: 29 Jan 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 04 Apr 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LORNE STEPHEN FINKELSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINKELSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1977