skip to content

Finkelberg, Frederick

CPSO#: 32974

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Nov 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300B
66 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Phone: (416) 482-6660
Fax: (416) 920-1880 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Finkelberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Weksberg ( CPSO# 31759 )
Dr. F. Finkelberg ( CPSO# 32974 )

Business Address:
300 B - 66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Phone Number: (416) 482-6660


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FREDERICK FINKELBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINKELBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1981