Fine, Michael Alexander (CPSO#: 100631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Endoscopy Centre
2125 Wyecroft Road
Unit 4
Oakville ON  L5L 5L7
Phone: (905) 827-7213
Fax: (905) 827-1343
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALEXANDER FINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2017