skip to content

Findlater, Andrew Ross

CPSO#: 29114

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jun 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective:30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Dec 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 1996