skip to content

Finch, Graham Charles

CPSO#: 20709

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Oshawa Clinic 117 King St E Oshawa ON
Date Received: 27 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 May 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017