skip to content

Filate, Woganee A

CPSO#: 86768

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street
Suie 1011
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 813-2277
Fax: (416) 260-3203 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sleep Care Solutions Davisville
1835 Yonge Street
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 792-9436
Fax: (416) 792-9436
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 2014
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Canada
Phone: (416) 229-2315
Fax: (416) 223-9828
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Woganee Filate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Filate ( CPSO# 86768 )

Business Address:
Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
Suite 1011
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 260-3203

Business Address:
Sleep Care Solutions Davisville
Suite 303
1835 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 792-9436

Business Address:
204 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 229-2315

Business Address:
302 - 2025 Midland Avenue
Toronto ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (416) 292-3218

Business Address:
1 - 802 Red River Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 1K2
Phone Number: (807) 683-4415

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WOGANEE A FILATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILATE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011