skip to content

Fikry, Alia Mahmoud

CPSO#: 90113

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Mar 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  June 30, 2015
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On January 26, 2017, London Health Sciences Centre and St. Joseph’s Health Care, London, (the “hospitals”) notified the College of the termination of Dr. Alia Fikry’s privileges at the hospitals as a result of Dr. Fikry’s dismissal from the paediatrics residency program at Western University’s Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, effective June 30, 2015.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 05 Jan 2009 to 30 Mar 2009
AVP - Pediatrics

Western University, 31 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015