skip to content

Figueroa, Luis

CPSO#: 91739

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Figueroa Gallaga, Luis Leovigildo (used until: 01 Mar 2015 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad La Salle Escuela, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1275 Finch Ave W
North York ON  M3J 0L5 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4700 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 1P3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4763 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 5M5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L. Figueroa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Figueroa ( CPSO# 91739 )

Business Address:
401 - 1017 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 742-2961

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
1275 Finch Ave W
North York ON  M3J 0L5


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Mexico

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUIS FIGUEROA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIGUEROA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Jul 2009
PEAP - R - Vascular Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016