skip to content

Figueredo, Alvaro Tell

CPSO#: 27580

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 20 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of the Republic, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Figueredo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Dec 2014