skip to content

Fienberg, Samantha Joy

CPSO#: 91474

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Chicago, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 742-3611 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

18 Pine street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Canada
Phone: (519) 570-0090
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Fienberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fienberg ( CPSO# 91474 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Radiology
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA JOY FIENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2009