skip to content

Fewster, Robert Frederick

CPSO#: 86976

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-1871
Fax: (519) 822-1990 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert F. Fewster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fewster ( CPSO# 86976 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-1871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT FREDERICK FEWSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEWSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2009