skip to content

Fetterly, Alexander Charles

CPSO#: 30395

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 2415 Marlene Stewart Street London ON N6K 5R3
Date Received: 18 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:29 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2017