skip to content

Ferroni-Fortier, Sandra Lyn

CPSO#: 101274

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Feb 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
COPPER CLIFF MEDICAL CLINIC
2 SERPENTINE STREET
Copper Cliff ON  P0M1N0
Phone: 705-682-0300 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

NORTHWOOD MEDICAL CLINICS
93 NOTRE DAME AVE W
Azilda ON  P0M 1B0
Canada
Phone: 705-522-3380
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

NORTHWOOD MEDICAL CLINICS
2009 LONG LAKE RD
Sudbury ON  P3E6C3
Canada
Phone: 705-522-3380
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sandra Ferroni-Fortier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ferroni-Fortier ( CPSO# 101274)

Business Address:
2 Serpentine Street
Copper Cliff ON  P0M 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 682-0300

Business Address:
93 Notre Dame Avenue West
Azilda ON  P0M 1B0
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Business Address:
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 522-3380

Business Address:
3140 - 8 Highway 69 North
Val Caron ON  P3N 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 222-1888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANDRA LYN FERRONI-FORTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERRONI-FORTIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 05 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 20 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2016