Ferreira, Alexander Mina (CPSO#: 96189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bancroft Family Health Team
19 Oak Street
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone: (613) 332-1565
Fax: (613) 332-0526
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Quinte Health Care - North Hastings
1 Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 3C0
Canada
Phone: (613) 332-2825
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Hastings Centennial Manor
1 Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Canada
Phone: (613) 332-2070
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander M. Ferreira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ferreira ( CPSO# 96189 )

Business Address:
Bancroft Family Health Team
19 Oak Street
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-1565

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care - North Hastings
1 Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 3C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2825

Business Address:
Hastings Centennial Manor
1 Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2070

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Aug 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER MINA FERREIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERREIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2013