skip to content

Fernando, M Nilanga G

CPSO#: 91957

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Nov 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
476 Peel Street
Floor 3 - Dr. Office
Woodstock ON  N4S 1K1
Phone: (519) 2908400
Fax: 226-401-4491 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

476 Peel Street
Floor 3
Woodstock
Ontario
Woodstock ON  N4S 1K1
Canada
Phone: (519) 537-2976
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:24 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. M NILANGA G FERNANDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 04 Aug 2009 to 26 Oct 2009
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 27 Oct 2009 to 15 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 16 Sep 2010 to 15 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 16 Sep 2011 to 15 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 16 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 24 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2018