skip to content

Fernando, Eshan

CPSO#: 101194

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Ave. W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Queensway W.
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eshan Fernando Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fernando ( CPSO# 101194)

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ESHAN FERNANDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017