skip to content

Fernandez, Gabriel

CPSO#: 18342

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Nov 1997

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Valladolid, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003