skip to content

Fernandes, Vinay Thomas

CPSO#: 93061

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2025 Midland Suite 401
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone: (416) 746-4545
Fax: (416) 746-1386 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

600 University Ave Suite 401
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416 586 8533
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Vinay T. Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hess ( CPSO# 90500 )
Dr. V. Fernandes ( CPSO# 93061 )

Business Address:
2025 Midland Avenue
Suite 401
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (416) 746-4545

Business Address:
531 Davis Drive
Suite 405
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 898-2240

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Suite 401
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VINAY THOMAS FERNANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016