skip to content

Fernandes, Hubert Cyril

CPSO#: 89784

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hubert Cyril Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Fernandes ( CPSO# 89784 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:20 Aug 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Apr 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2011 Active
             Dr.   Hubert   Cyril   Fernandes   may   practise   medicine  independently  in
            Anaesthesiology, only.