skip to content

Nadon, Fernand Gaston Vincent

CPSO#: 57720

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 15 Apr 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Apr 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vincent Nadon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1986
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 17 May 2018
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 Apr 2020

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Apr 2020
Summary:

On April 15, 2020, on the basis of agreed facts and admission, the Discipline Committee 
(the “Committee”) of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. 
Fernand Gaston Vincent Nadon (“Dr. Nadon”) committed an act of professional 
misconduct. The Committee set out its penalty and costs order with written reasons to 
follow. 

FACTS 

Background  
 
Dr. Nadon is a 58 year-old physician who received his certificate of registration 
authorizing independent practice from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario (“the College) on September 17, 1986.   
 
At the relevant time, Dr. Nadon practised at the University of Ottawa Health Services in 
Ottawa, Ontario.  
 
On May 16, 2018, the ICRC directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Nadon’s certificate of 
registration, without notice, under s. 25.4(7) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, 
which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991.  
 
In January 2018, Dr. Nadon was charged with sexual assault and voyeurism after one of 
his patients complained that he made a video recording of her clinical appointment with 
him, without her consent, using his personal mobile phone during a medical exam at the 
University of Ottawa Health Services. The patient alleged that she had watched a 
recording that Dr. Nadon made of her entire appointment including her disrobing in the 
room alone and her physical examination (including her breasts and vagina). The 
appointment was for the patient's pap smear screening procedure. Immediately after 
the appointment, the female patient notified the receptionist and a nurse about her 
concerns.  
 
The office manager spoke with Dr. Nadon in the evening of January 16, 2018. He 
admitted to video recording the clinical procedure of the patient without her consent on 
his personal phone, but advised that he did it for future teaching purposes. He told staff 
that he deleted the video recording in front of the patient and did not keep a copy.  
 
The female patient reported the matter to the Ottawa police. Dr. Nadon was arrested on 
January 18, 2018 and charged with one count of sexual assault and voyeurism. 
Subsequent to a news release, additional patients came forward to the Ottawa Police 
alleging that they too felt that they had been surreptitiously videotaped during their 
interactions with Dr. Nadon. Dr. Nadon was removed from his position at the University 
of Ottawa Clinics. Dr. Nadon was charged with 94 charges of voyeurism and sexual 
assault involving 51 victims. 
  
 On December 5, 2018, Dr. Nadon pleaded guilty to 14 counts of voyeurism and sexual 
 assault relating to 49 victims. He pleaded guilty to sexually assaulting 21 victims, and to 
 voyeurism in relation to 38 victims. All of the victims were his patients.  
  
 The facts admitted by Dr. Nadon in the criminal proceeding are admitted by him in this 
proceeding as well. These included the following facts:  
  
      The accused, Vincent Nadon, is a medical doctor who at the relevant time 
      maintained a family medicine, travel medicine and immigration medicine practice 
      with the University of Ottawa Health Services. Many of the victims identified 
      below were recent immigrants to Canada 
 
            In January 2018, Patient A. attended at the University of Ottawa Health 
            Services Clinic located at 316 Rideau Street. Patient A was seen by the 
            accused, Vincent Nadon, in an examination room at the clinic where she 
            had a reasonable expectation of privacy and where she could reasonably 
            be expected to expose her genital organs, anal region or breasts. The 
            accused, Vincent Nadon, conducted a physical examination of Patient A 
            which included a breast examination and a Pap test, which were 
            performed for a sexual purpose, without the consent of Patient A The 
            accused, Vincent Nadon, surreptitiously video recorded Patient A in the 
            examination room with an iPhone hidden in a cabinet. The video recording 
            captured the physical examination during which Patient A’s breasts were 
            exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in the 
            examination room. The video recording made by the accused, Vincent 
            Nadon, did not serve the public good, which relates to a possible defence 
            in the Criminal Code. 
 
            After Patient A was dressed, she noticed the phone and picked it up and 
            examined it. She observed it was recording. She stopped the recording 
            and reviewed the video which began with Mr. Nadon placing the phone in 
            the cabinet. Patient A confronted Nadon with the phone. He initially denied 
            that it was recording. After unlocking the phone and viewing the video he 
            apologized and stated that he sometimes recorded exams for training 
            purposes. When Patient A asked why she had not been advised of this in 
            advance in order to provide consent, Nadon agreed, apologized and 
            deleted the video in front of her. 
 
            The following day, Nadon was observed leaving his residence and driving 
            to the vacant parking lot at the FreshMart in Chelsea, Quebec. At 2301 
            hours he was observed placing a black garbage bag into the garbage 
            dumpster. The garbage bag contained a computer hard drive broken in 
            two pieces. The hard drive had been damaged and no data was able to be 
            retrieved from it. 
      A search warrant was subsequently executed by the Ottawa Police at the 
      residence of Vincent Nadon. A computer hard drive was seized from the office 
      area of the home and examined. The examination revealed 42 videos that had 
      been copied from an iPhone and then deleted. 
       
At the University of Ottawa Health Services the accused, Vincent Nadon, would see and 
examine patients in clinic examination rooms. When in those clinic examination rooms, 
patients had a reasonable expectation of privacy. When in clinic examination rooms, 
these patients were in a place where they could reasonably be expected to expose their 
genital organs, anal region or breasts. Between January 2010 and August 2011 the 
accused, Vincent Nadon, surreptitiously made video recordings of the following patients 
while they were in examination rooms at the University of Ottawa Health Services Clinic 
located at 100 Marie Curie Private: 
 
      Patient B. In January 2010 the video captured the physical examination during 
      which Patient B’s breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing 
      and dressing in the examination room. 
       
      Patient C. In January 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
      Patient C's breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and 
      dressing in the examination room. 
       
      Patient D. In January 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
      Patient D.'s breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and 
      dressing in the examination room. Nadon moved her clothing to a location that 
      would cause her to get dressed in view of the camera. 
       
      Patient E. In January 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
      Patient E's breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and 
      dressing in the examination room. 
       
      Patient F. In February 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
      Patient F's breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and 
      dressing in the examination room. Nadon moved her clothing to a location that 
      would cause her to get dressed in view of the camera. 
       
      Patient G. In February 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
      Patient G's breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and 
      dressing in the examination room. 
       
      Patient H. In February 2010, capturing the physical examination during which her 
      breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in 
      the examination room. 
       
Patient I. In February 2010, capturing the physical examination during which her 
breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in 
the examination room.  
 
Patient J. In February 2010, capturing the physical examination during which her 
breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in 
the examination room. 
 
Patient K. In February 2010, capturing the physical examination during which her 
breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in 
the examination room. 
 
Patient L. In February  2010, capturing the physical examination during which her 
breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in 
the examination room. 
 
Patient M. In March 2010, capturing the physical examination during which her 
breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in 
the examination room. 
 
Patient N. In March 2010, capturing the physical examination during which her 
breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in 
the examination room. 
 
Patient O. In March 2010, capturing the physical examination during which her 
breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in 
the examination room. 
 
Patient P. In March 2010, capturing the physical examination during which her 
breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in 
the examination room. Nadon moved her clothing to a location that would cause 
her to get dressed in view of the camera. 
 
Patient Q. In June 2010, capturing the physical examination during which her 
breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in 
the examination room. Nadon moved her clothing to a location that would cause 
her to get dressed in view of the camera. 
 
Patient R. In June 2010, capturing the physical examination during which Patient 
R's breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her dressing in the 
examination room. 
                   
 Patient S. In June 2010, capturing the physical examination during which Patient 
 S.'s breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing 
 in the examination room. 
  
 Patient T. In July 2010, capturing the physical examination during which her 
 breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in 
 the examination room. Nadon moved her clothing to a location that would cause 
 her to get dressed in view of the camera. 
  
 Patient U. In July 2010, capturing her dressing in the examination room. 
  
 Patient V. In September 2010, capturing her undressing in the examination room. 
  
 Patient W. In September 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
 her breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing 
 in the examination room. 
  
 Patient X. In September 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
 her breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing 
 in the examination room. Nadon moved her clothing to a location that would 
 cause her to get dressed in view of the camera. 
 
Patient Y. In November 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
her breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing 
in the examination room. Nadon moved her clothing to a location that would 
cause her to get dressed in view of the camera. 
 
Patient Z. In November 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
her breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing 
in the examination room. Nadon moved her clothing to a location that would 
cause her to get dressed in view of the camera. 
 
Patient AA. In November 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
her breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing 
in the examination room. 
 
Patient BB. In November 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
her breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing 
in the examination room. 
 
Patient CC. In November 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
her breasts were exposed to the camera. 
 
Patient DD. In December 2010, capturing her getting dressed in the examination 
room. 
 
Patient EE. In December 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
her breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing 
in the examination room. Nadon moved her clothing to a location that would 
cause her to get dressed in view of the camera. 
 
Patient FF. In December 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
her breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing 
in the examination room. 
 
Patient GG. In December 2010, capturing the physical examination during which 
her breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing 
in the examination room. 
 
Patient HH. In January 2011, capturing the physical examination during which her 
breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in 
the examination room. Nadon moved her clothing to a location that would cause 
her to get dressed in view of the camera. 
 
Patient II. In February 2011, capturing the physical examination during which her 
breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing in the 
examination room. 
 
Patient JJ. In February 2011, capturing the physical examination during which her 
breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in 
the examination room. 
 
Patient KK. In February 2011, capturing the physical examination during which 
her breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing 
in the examination room. 
 
Patient LL. In March 2011, capturing her dressing in the examination room. 
 
Patient MM. In March 2011, capturing the physical examination during which her 
breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and dressing in 
the examination room. 
 
Patient NN. In June 2011, capturing the physical examination during which 
Patient NN's breasts were exposed to the camera as well as her undressing and 
dressing in the examination room. 
 
      Patient OO. In August 2011, capturing her getting dressed in the examination 
      room.  
 
Between January 2010 and February 2011, the accused, Vincent Nadon, conducted 
physical examinations on the following patients at the University of Ottawa Health 
Services Clinic located at 316 Rideau Street. 
 
      Patient PP. In January 2010, at which time the accused, Vincent Nadon, touched 
      her breasts for a sexual purpose without her consent, by reaching from behind 
      and cupping both breasts at once. 
       
      Patient QQ. In January 2010, at which time the accused, Vincent Nadon, 
      commenced a Pap test with only one hand gloved, then proceeded to remove 
      that glove and reinserted his gloveless hand into the patient’s vagina, after first 
      putting his fingers to his nose/mouth area, all for a sexual purpose and without 
      the patient’s consent. At the end of the examination he made a no - noise near 
      the garbage can as though he were removing gloves and discarding them. 
       
      Patient RR. In February 2010, at which time the accused, Vincent Nadon, touched 
      her left breast for a sexual purpose and without her consent. 
       
      Patient SS. In February 2010, at which time the accused, Vincent Nadon, touched 
      her breast by reaching from behind and cupping both breasts at once, as well as 
      commenced a Pap test with only one hand gloved, proceeded to remove that 
      glove and then reinserted his gloveless hand into the patient’s vagina after first 
      putting his fingers to his nose/mouth area, all for a sexual purpose and without 
      the patient’s consent. At the end of the examination he made a noise near the 
      garbage can as though he were removing gloves and discarding them. 
       
      Patient TT. In February 2010, at which time the accused, Vincent Nadon, 
      performed a Pap test with only one hand gloved, which was for a sexual purpose 
      and without the patient’s consent. At the end of the examination he made a noise 
      near the garbage can as though he were removing two gloves and discarding 
      them. 
       
      Patient UU, In March 2010, at which time the accused, Vincent Nadon, performed 
      a Pap test with only hand gloved, which was for a sexual purpose, and without 
      the patient's consent. 
       
      Patient VV. In March 2010, at which time the accused, Vincent Nadon, performed 
      a Pap test with only one hand gloved, which was for a sexual purpose and 
      without the patient’s consent. 
       
      Patient WW. In March 2010, at which time the accused, Vincent Nadon, touched 
      her breasts by pushing them together and performed a Pap test with only one 
      hand gloved, all of which was for a sexual purpose and without the patient’s 
      consent. 
       
      Patient XX. In November 2010, at which time the accused, Vincent Nadon, 
      touched her breasts for a sexual purpose and without her consent. Nadon 
      reached from behind and touched both breasts at once in a groping manner and 
      pinched both nipples. He moved the patient’s face to the camera, had her bend 
      over and shake her breasts and then he said, “marvelous”. 
       
      Patient YY. In February 2011, at which time the accused, Vincent Nadon, touched 
      her breasts for a sexual purpose without her consent. 
 
As a result of the initial charges laid in relation to the complainant, Patient A, a media 
release was issued and a number of other victims came forward, including the following 
victims: 
 
      Patient ZZ. Between November 1990 and July 2002 Patient ZZ attended at the 
      University of Ottawa Health Services Clinic located at 100 Marie Curie Private 
      where she was seen by the accused, Vincent Nadon. The accused, Mr. Nadon, 
      conducted an examination during which he touched Patient ZZ's breasts for a 
      sexual purpose and without her consent. 
       
      Patient AAA. Between October 1992 and November 1993 Patient AAA attended 
      at the University of Ottawa Health Services Clinic located at 100 Marie Curie 
      Private where she was seen by the accused, Vincent Nadon. The accused, Mr. 
      Nadon, conducted vaginal examinations without gloves and breast examinations 
      during which he shook her breasts and pinched her nipples and made 
      inappropriate comments about her breasts, all for a sexual purpose and without 
      her consent. 
       
      Patient BBB. In February 1993 Patient BBB attended at the University of Ottawa 
      Health Services Clinic located at 100 Marie Curie Private for a referral to a 
      psychologist. She was seen by the accused, Vincent Nadon, in an examination 
      room at the clinic. After asking Patient BBB to disrobe, the accused, Vincent 
      Nadon, conducted a medically unnecessary physical examination of Patient BBB 
      during which he touched her naked body. He touched her body for a sexual 
      purpose without her consent. 
      
     Patient CCC. In June 1995 Patient CCC attended at the University of Ottawa 
     Health Services Clinic located at 100 Marie Curie Private where she was seen by 
     the accused, Vincent Nadon, in an examination room at the clinic. Vincent Nadon 
conducted a breast examination of Patient CCC during which he grabbed and 
pinched her nipples for a sexual purpose without her consent. 
 
Patient DDD. In March 1997 Patient DDD attended at the University of Ottawa 
Health Services Clinic located at 100 Marie Curie Private for an immigration 
physical where she was seen by the accused, Vincent Nadon. The accused, 
Vincent Nadon, conducted a physical examination of Patient DDD which included 
an internal vaginal examination which was medically unnecessary and performed 
for a sexual purpose without her consent. 
 
Patient EEE. Between January 1999 and December 2004 Patient EEE attended at 
the University of Ottawa Health Services Clinic located at 100 Marie Curie Private 
where she was seen by the accused, Vincent Nadon. During the procedure to 
remove a genital wart, the accused, Vincent Nadon, touched her genital area for a 
sexual purpose and without her consent. 
 
Patient FFF. In September 2012 Patient FFF attended at the University of Ottawa 
Health Services Clinic located at 100 Marie Curie Private where she was seen by 
the accused, Vincent Nadon, in an examination room. The accused, Vincent 
Nadon, conducted a vaginal examination during which he touched her clitoris for 
a sexual purpose, without the consent of Patient FFF. 
 
Patient GGG. In May 2013 Patient GGG attended at the University of Ottawa 
Health Services Clinic where she was seen by the accused, Vincent Nadon. 
Vincent Nadon stared at Patient GGG's naked body and asked her inappropriate 
questions about her sexual history while he conducted a physical exam for a 
sexual purpose and without the consent of Patient GGG. At the completion of the 
exam he remained in the examination room while Patient GGG got dressed and 
told her, “It’s fine. I see parts of you that you'll never see.” 
 
Patient HHH. In May 2015 Patient HHH attended the University of Ottawa Health 
Services Clinic where she was seen by the accused, Vincent Nadon. Vincent 
Nadon touched Patient HHH's breasts for a sexual purpose, without the consent 
of Patient HHH. 
 
Patient III. In August 2017 Patient III attended at the University of Ottawa Health 
Services Clinic located at 316 Rideau Street with the complaint of sore ribs. She 
was seen by the accused, Vincent Nadon, in an examination room at the clinic. 
Patient III. lifted the side of her shirt for her ribs to be examined. After feeling her 
ribs, without forewarning or consent, the accused, Vincent Nadon, groped both of 
Patient III's breasts over her bra. The accused, Vincent Nadon, touched her 
breasts for a sexual purpose without her consent. 
 
 Dr. Nadon’s criminal sentence included a global sentence of eight (8) years in jail (seven 
 to be served after sentencing, given time spent in pre-trial custody). 
  
 At sentencing, Dr. Nadon’s lawyer submitted that Dr. Nadon “will undoubtedly see his 
 licence revoked once the College finishes with their process” as a result of his “gross 
 breach of trust … over a lengthy period of time”. In his reasons for sentence, the judge 
agreed that Dr. Nadon’s breach of trust was “egregious” and noted that “the conviction 
will most likely strip you of your licence to ever practice any kind of medicine ever again. 
 
Dr. Nadon does not contest the facts specified above, and does not contest that, based 
on these facts, he engaged in professional misconduct, in that:  
          
      (a) he engaged in sexual abuse of a patient, under clause 51(1)(b.1) of the Health 
         Professions Procedural Code ; 
      (b) he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
      having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
      members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, under paragraph 
      1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93, made under the Medicine Act, 1991 
      (“O/Reg. 856/93”); and  
      (c) he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to 
      practise, under clause 51(1)(a) of the Code. 
  
 FINDING 
  
 The Committee found that Dr. Nadon committed an act of professional misconduct 
 under: 

       (i)   clause 51(1)(b.1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is 
             Schedule 2 of the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, in that he 
             sexually abused a patient. 

       (ii)  paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine 
             Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the 
             practice of medicine that, having regarding to all the circumstances, would 
             reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
             unprofessional. 

       (iii) clause 51(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is 
             Schedule 2 of the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, in that he has 
             been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. 
PENALTY AND COSTS 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Nadon to attend before the panel to be 
reprimanded. 
 
The Discipline Committee directed the Registrar to revoke Dr. Nadon’s certificate of 
registration effective immediately. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Nadon to reimburse the College for funding 
provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by 
posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within 
thirty (30) days of this Order in the amount of $786,940.00 ($16,060.00 per 49 patients). 
  
The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Nadon to pay costs to the College in the amount 
of $6000.00 within 30 days of the date of the Order.  
 
DECISION AND REASONS 
 
On July 14, 2020, the Committee released its Decision and Reasons in this matter. The 
full document is available for view on the College’s website.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): April 15, 2020

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: December 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Vincent Nadon was found guilty of the following offences:

1. 2 counts of voyeurism, contrary to Section 162(1)(a) of the Criminal Code.
2. 12 counts of sexual assault, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: December 5, 2018
SENTENCE: 8 years imprisonment; Victim Surcharge of $800; SOIRA (Sex Offender Information Registration Act) order for life; 10 year prohibition on possession of weapons.