skip to content

Fergusson, Mary Ellen

CPSO#: 93699

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Nov 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
100 Stokes St
Toronto ON  M6J1H4
Phone: 416 535 8501 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:31 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY ELLEN FERGUSSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2015