skip to content

Ferguson, Charles Brendan

CPSO#: 92217

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2009 to 10 Jan 2010
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2010