skip to content

Ferenc, Aleksandra Monika

CPSO#: 97323

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KJK Healthplex
1100 Dundas St. W., Unit 4
Mississauga ON  L5C 4E7
Phone: (416) 530-4966
Fax: (416) 530-4457 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Feb 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016 Active
 Dr.  Aleksandra  Monika  Ferenc  may  practise medicine independently in family
            medicine.