skip to content

Ferdman, Doron

CPSO#: 95706

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Spartan Health Sciences University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care
13291 Yonge St #100
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759 Ext. 4
Fax: (905) 773-1325 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty St S
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Altum Health - Vaughan Site
14/15-8707 Dufferin Street
Thornhill, Ontario
Vaughan ON  L4J 0A2
Canada
Phone: 905-738-0007
Fax: 905-738-0017
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Medcan
150 York Street, Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: 4163505967
Fax: 4163505981
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DORON FERDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013