Fera, Luke Anthony (CPSO#: 100978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 5352
Fax: 7057593731
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Westend Walk-in Clinic
658 Second Line West
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6C 2K9
Canada
Phone: 705-450-5339
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luke A. Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Fera ( CPSO# 100978)

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
658 Second Line West
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6C 2K9
Phone Number: (705) 257-0294

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUKE ANTHONY FERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2016