skip to content

Fenyves, Daphna

CPSO#: 30841

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 May 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2014