Feloiu, Florin Daniel (CPSO#: 90684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 40813
Fax: (905) 577-8233
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CAMBRIDGE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
700 CORONATION BLVD
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (519) 621-2333
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

HOTEL DIEU SHAVER REHABILITATION
541 GLENRIDGE AVENUE
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Canada
Phone: (905) 685-1381
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

ST. JOSEPHS HEALTHCARE HAMILTON
50 CHARLTON AVENUE
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Florin Feloiu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Feloiu ( CPSO# 90684 )

Business Address:
Regional Rehabilitation
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Shaver Rehab
541 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone Number: (905) 685-1381

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FLORIN DANIEL FELOIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELOIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014